NY A10599 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7454
Status: Introduced on April 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7454
Summary
Extends the period of time during which certain real property tax exemptions apply.
Title
Extends the period of time during which certain real property tax exemptions apply.
Sponsors
Asm. Vito Lopez [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | substituted by s7454 | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.537 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-06-24 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-08 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07454 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.524
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10599&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |