NY S07443 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of special districts for general ambulance services and requires a report on issues of volunteer firefighter and ambulance services staffing.
Title
Relates to the establishment of special districts for general ambulance services and requires a report on issues of volunteer firefighter and ambulance services staffing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1766 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09589 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - referred to local governments