NY S07395 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Title
Relates to authorizing the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1765 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7395D |
2018-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-02-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7395C |
2018-02-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7395B |
2018-02-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7395A |
2018-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A08940 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE