NY A08940 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Title
Relates to authorizing the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.2 |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | print number 8940a |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07395 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - referred to agriculture
S07986 (Same As) 2018-03-16 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S07986 (Same As) 2018-03-16 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE