NY S07382 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that a resident taxpayer shall be allowed a credit against the tax in an amount equaling thirty percent of the qualified adoption expenses paid during the taxable year in conjunction with the taxpayer's adoption of a handicapped child or a hard to place child or five thousand dollars whichever is less.
Title
Establishes that a resident taxpayer shall be allowed a credit against the tax in an amount equaling thirty percent of the qualified adoption expenses paid during the taxable year in conjunction with the taxpayer's adoption of a handicapped child or a hard to place child or five thousand dollars whichever is less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1236 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10545 (Same As) 2018-05-04 - referred to ways and means