NY S07357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the departments of agriculture and markets, environmental conservation, labor, transportation and taxation and finance shall designate an existing employee to serve as its liaison to small businesses regulated by such department; further provides the duties of such small business liaison.
Title
Provides that the departments of agriculture and markets, environmental conservation, labor, transportation and taxation and finance shall designate an existing employee to serve as its liaison to small businesses regulated by such department; further provides the duties of such small business liaison.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.342 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A10187 (Same As) 2020-03-24 - referred to governmental operations