NY S07335 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 7335A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 7335A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the prohibition on the eviction of residential tenants who have suffered financial hardship during the COVID-19 covered period through April 15, 2022.
Title
Extends the prohibition on the eviction of residential tenants who have suffered financial hardship during the COVID-19 covered period through April 15, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7335A |
2022-01-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-08-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08240 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - print number 8240a