NY S07300 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conducting investigations into the administration and enforcement of the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code and the New York state energy conservation construction code by counties.
Title
Relates to conducting investigations into the administration and enforcement of the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code and the New York state energy conservation construction code by counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7300B |
2020-02-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.396 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7300A |
2020-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09631 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - print number 9631b