NY S07291 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of labor and the president of the civil service commission to prepare reports on how many women were referred to counseling or skills development and training for jobs and careers that offer higher earning potential, including jobs traditionally dominated by men.
Title
Directs the commissioner of labor and the president of the civil service commission to prepare reports on how many women were referred to counseling or skills development and training for jobs and careers that offer higher earning potential, including jobs traditionally dominated by men.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9755 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1195 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09755 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.460