NY A09755 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of labor and the president of the civil service commission to prepare reports on how many women were referred to counseling or skills development and training for jobs and careers that offer higher earning potential, including jobs traditionally dominated by men.
Title
Directs the commissioner of labor and the president of the civil service commission to prepare reports on how many women were referred to counseling or skills development and training for jobs and careers that offer higher earning potential, including jobs traditionally dominated by men.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.460 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1195 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7291 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.34 |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07291 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9755