NY S07223 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 7223A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 7223A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Carl Spatola to receive a refund from the New York state teachers' retirement system due to overpayment.
Title
Authorizes Carl Spatola to receive a refund from the New York state teachers' retirement system due to overpayment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7223A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08197 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental employees
A08198 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - print number 8198a
A08198 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - print number 8198a