NY S07209 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - SIGNED CHAP.800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a retroactive retirement date of August 5, 2010 from the New York state and local police and fire retirement system for Cariol Horne.
Title
Grants a retroactive retirement date of August 5, 2010 from the New York state and local police and fire retirement system for Cariol Horne.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.800 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.795 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a8026 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1758 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08026 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7209