NY S07191 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates the Main-Transit Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association and provides for its powers and duties.
Title
Incorporates the Main-Transit Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association and provides for its powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.425 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.583 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10043 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1128 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10043 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7191