NY S07186 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of alternate physicians who may be appointed by the board, the commissioner of health, and the commissioner of citywide administrative services from four to seven, who shall hold office at the pleasure of such appointing board or official.
Title
Increases the number of alternate physicians who may be appointed by the board, the commissioner of health, and the commissioner of citywide administrative services from four to seven, who shall hold office at the pleasure of such appointing board or official.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.330 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09555 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - referred to governmental employees