NY S07173 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to telepsychiatry and requires a study, report and recommendations regarding geriatric social isolation.
Title
Relates to telepsychiatry and requires a study, report and recommendations regarding geriatric social isolation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7173A |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08888 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES