NY S07171 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9019A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to impact studies on tick-borne diseases; requires the department to issue a report examining the mental health impacts of tick-borne diseases and blood-borne pathogens on mental illness rates in endemic areas of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to impact studies on tick-borne diseases; requires the department to issue a report examining the mental health impacts of tick-borne diseases and blood-borne pathogens on mental illness rates in endemic areas of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9019A
2018-05-15SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7171A
2018-05-15SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-15Senatereturned to senate
2018-05-15AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-03-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.403
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A09019 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.364

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback