NY A09019 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to impact studies on tick-borne diseases; requires the department to issue a report examining the mental health impacts of tick-borne diseases and blood-borne pathogens on mental illness rates in endemic areas of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to impact studies on tick-borne diseases; requires the department to issue a report examining the mental health impacts of tick-borne diseases and blood-borne pathogens on mental illness rates in endemic areas of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.364
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.403
2018-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7171A
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2018-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.921
2018-05-15Assemblyreported
2018-04-25Assemblyprint number 9019a
2018-04-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2018-03-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-01-12Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S07171 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9019A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09019
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09019A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09019&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A9019#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback