NY S07164 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the definition for legislation; provides that such proposed language shall be presented in a clear and concise manner, be limited to 50 pages and use words that have common everyday meanings.
Title
Establishes the definition for legislation; provides that such proposed language shall be presented in a clear and concise manner, be limited to 50 pages and use words that have common everyday meanings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-08-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7164A |
2021-08-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2021-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09359 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - print number 9359a
A09902 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to governmental operations
A09902 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to governmental operations