NY A09359 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - print number 9359a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - print number 9359a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the definition for legislation; provides that such proposed language shall be presented in a clear and concise manner, be limited to 50 pages and use words that have common everyday meanings.
Title
Establishes the definition for legislation; provides that such proposed language shall be presented in a clear and concise manner, be limited to 50 pages and use words that have common everyday meanings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Assembly | print number 9359a |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07164 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A09902 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to governmental operations
A09902 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to governmental operations