NY S07136 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7907A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7907A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Dutchess Wine Trail.
Title
Expands the Dutchess Wine Trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7907A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1273 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1675 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07907 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.245