NY A07907 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Dutchess Wine Trail.
Title
Expands the Dutchess Wine Trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.245 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1273 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7136 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.544 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7907a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07136 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7907A