NY S07117 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allocating hotel or motel tax revenues for the promotion of tourism and tourist attractions in Seneca county.
Title
Relates to allocating hotel or motel tax revenues for the promotion of tourism and tourist attractions in Seneca county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.599 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.780 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7967 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07967 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7117