NY S07116 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires judges who recuse themselves to provide the reason for the recusal; provides an exception when the reason for the recusal will result in embarrassment or is of a compelling personal nature.
Title
Requires judges who recuse themselves to provide the reason for the recusal; provides an exception when the reason for the recusal will result in embarrassment or is of a compelling personal nature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.406 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09542 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.376