NY S07101 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of diplomas to youth who are placed, committed, supervised, detained or confined in certain facilities; provides that persons under twenty-one years of age who are placed with, committed to, under the supervision of, detained or otherwise confined in certain facilities, who participate in an educational program provided by such facilities, shall be issued a high school diploma upon completion of the minimum New York state diploma requirements.
Title
Relates to the issuance of diplomas to youth who are placed, committed, supervised, detained or confined in certain facilities; provides that persons under twenty-one years of age who are placed with, committed to, under the supervision of, detained or otherwise confined in certain facilities, who participate in an educational program provided by such facilities, shall be issued a high school diploma upon completion of the minimum New York state diploma requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7576 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1473 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07576 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.117