NY S07087 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7987
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7987
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to form a pure captive insurance company.
Title
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to form a pure captive insurance company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7987 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.714 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1755 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7087A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07987 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - signed chap.193