NY A07987 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to form a pure captive insurance company.
Title
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to form a pure captive insurance company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | signed chap.193 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.714 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7087A |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.437 |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07087 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7987