NY S07078 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10041B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10041B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to wild and exotic animal protection; prohibits release of such animals; requires owners of exotic animals to pay for costs associated with animal recapture.
Title
Relates to wild and exotic animal protection; prohibits release of such animals; requires owners of exotic animals to pay for costs associated with animal recapture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10041B |
2012-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7078B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1046 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7078A |
2012-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10041 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - signed chap.326