NY S07077 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Wheatfield Volunteer Firefighter's Benevolent Association.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Wheatfield Volunteer Firefighter's Benevolent Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.462 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.838 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7409a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1771 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7077A |
2023-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07409 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7077a