NY S07072 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections; increases number on county committee.
Title
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections; increases number on county committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.734 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7072A |
2016-04-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2016-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
S04560 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A04189 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
A04189 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS