NY S04560 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections.
Title
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.645 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |