NY S07063 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the definition of a campground to say it shall not include land owned by the state.
Title
Revises the definition of a campground to say it shall not include land owned by the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.68 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.436 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9006 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.179 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09006 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.68