NY S07051 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10109
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10109
Summary
Allows members of the New York state and local police and fire retirement system who retire to elect the alternative option and provides for cessation of membership in such system upon the occurrence of certain conditions.
Title
Allows members of the New York state and local police and fire retirement system who retire to elect the alternative option and provides for cessation of membership in such system upon the occurrence of certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10109 | |
2010-06-23 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1135 | |
2010-06-14 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-09 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10109 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - signed chap.498
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07051&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |