NY S07048 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the canine officer health monitoring fund which allows for applicants to request reimbursement from the division of criminal justice services for health costs related to regular health or injury associated with canine officers.
Title
Establishes the canine officer health monitoring fund which allows for applicants to request reimbursement from the division of criminal justice services for health costs related to regular health or injury associated with canine officers.
Sponsors
Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Peter Oberacker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-03-08 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08065 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations