NY S07046 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7968
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain defendants in a criminal action in Chemung, Schuyler, or Yates county to appear electronically, with the approval of the court.
Title
Permits certain defendants in a criminal action in Chemung, Schuyler, or Yates county to appear electronically, with the approval of the court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7968 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1853 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07968 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.246