NY A07968 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain defendants in a criminal action in Chemung, Schuyler, or Yates county to appear electronically, with the approval of the court.
Title
Permits certain defendants in a criminal action in Chemung, Schuyler, or Yates county to appear electronically, with the approval of the court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.246 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1853 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7046 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.606 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07046 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7968