NY S07018 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Schenectady, county of Schenectady, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands for the purpose of relocating historic homes that are at a high risk of flooding.
Title
Authorizes the city of Schenectady, county of Schenectady, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands for the purpose of relocating historic homes that are at a high risk of flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1434 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1508 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7018A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 2 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |
Same As/Similar To
A07809 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means