NH SB488 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of physician assistants.
Title
Relative to the regulation of physician assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/01/2024 |
2024-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 35 |
2024-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/08/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 10 |
2024-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0396s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0396s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0396s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |