NY A07809 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Schenectady, county of Schenectady, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands for the purpose of relocating historic homes that are at a high risk of flooding.
Title
Authorizes the city of Schenectady, county of Schenectady, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands for the purpose of relocating historic homes that are at a high risk of flooding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7809a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07018 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES