NY S07018 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for unlisted telephone directory numbers without charge, for victims of domestic violence for whose benefit an order of protection has been issued by a court of competent jurisdiction.
Title
Provides for unlisted telephone directory numbers without charge, for victims of domestic violence for whose benefit an order of protection has been issued by a court of competent jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1794 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
S04789 (Same As) 2017-03-01 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
A10702 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A10702 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions