NY S07011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 7011B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 7011B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the resale of tickets issued at no charge.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the resale of tickets issued at no charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7011B |
2018-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7011A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
S01848 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
A04612 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - print number 4612b
A04612 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - print number 4612b