NY A04612 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 4612b
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 4612b
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the resale of tickets issued at no charge.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the resale of tickets issued at no charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | print number 4612b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 4612a |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01848 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07011 (Same As) 2018-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 7011B
S07011 (Same As) 2018-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 7011B