NY S06979 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount paid to lease a polling station.
Title
Relates to the amount paid to lease a polling station.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7597 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.731 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07597 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - signed chap.43