NY S06969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home-schooled children to participate in interscholastic athletic activities and driver's education in the district where they reside.
Title
Allows home-schooled children to participate in interscholastic athletic activities and driver's education in the district where they reside.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2017-12-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06923 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken