NY A06923 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home-schooled children to participate in interscholastic athletic activities and driver's education in the district where they reside.
Title
Allows home-schooled children to participate in interscholastic athletic activities and driver's education in the district where they reside.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06969 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION