NY S06968 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hemp, cannabinoid hemp, and hemp extract.
Title
Relates to hemp, cannabinoid hemp, and hemp extract.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | signed chap.1 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.47 |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6968 |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.334 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2020-01-07 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2020-01-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8977 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.47 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08977 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1