NY A08977 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hemp, cannabinoid hemp, and hemp extract.
Title
Relates to hemp, cannabinoid hemp, and hemp extract.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | signed chap.1 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.47 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6968 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.334 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S06968 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - signed chap.1