NY S06967 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the effective date for the tax exempt status of the real property of a land bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the effective date for the tax exempt status of the real property of a land bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.172
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a8881
2018-03-19Assemblyreferred to local governments
2018-03-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.590
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2017-12-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08881 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6967

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback