NY S06961 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Title
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.641 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-11-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03627 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO AGING