NY S06957 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing retail licenses to purchase beer with a business payment card.
Title
Relates to authorizing retail licenses to purchase beer with a business payment card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.36 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09747 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means