NY S06954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing of independent insurance adjusters by waiving requirements regarding character references and a written examination if the applicant holds a claim certification from a national or state-based claims association.
Title
Relates to licensing of independent insurance adjusters by waiving requirements regarding character references and a written examination if the applicant holds a claim certification from a national or state-based claims association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6954A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.730 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-11-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10998 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - print number 10998a